Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Reyes, Veronica, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Downtown L.A. Law Group, Downtown La Law Group, against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Does 2 Through 100, Inclusive, Knolls West Convalescent Hospital, Knolls West Post Acute Llc, Knolls West Post Acute, Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Evans, Trent, Giovanniello Law Group, Khachatryan, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A Sachs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Answer Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Answer Filed
Date: November 04, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 11, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: December 20, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Declaration re:
Date: June 28, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 22, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 10, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 11, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: December 14, 2020Proof of Personal Service of Summons Elec Filed
Date: December 26, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 27, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 03, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope #13552678 Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: Document returned. Attorney information does not match the information on file. Please submit a notice of change of address to change address. Please correct and resubmit. Should you have any question you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm. |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service of Summons Elec Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant With prejudice |
|
November 06, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
November 02, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: Motion in Limine to Limit Expert Testimony to those Opinions Offered at Deposiiton |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: Motion in Limine to Exclude any Evidence of Electronically Recorded Confidential Communications |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Lawsuits |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.