Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Montiel, Justino, Redwood Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Product Liability Unlimited case represented by The Law Offices Of Arash Khorsandi Pc, against Does 1 To 100, Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi High-Tech Science America, Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi Solutions America, Ltd., (total of 16) See All represented by Bowman And Brooke Llp, Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: May 13, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: June 16, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Answer Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Declaration re:
Date: June 16, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Objection Filed
Date: August 17, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 03, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: October 13, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 13, 2022Reply Filed
Date: November 07, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 04, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: June 16, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 11, 2022Proof of Service
Date: December 22, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 25, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: September 21, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 04, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 09, 2023Answer Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 09, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: August 29, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 01, 2023Supplemental Brief Filed
Date: August 17, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 03, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 18, 2022Declaration re:
Date: June 16, 2022Answer Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Answer Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Answer Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Answer Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Memorandum of Costs
Date: September 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 03, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Notice
Date: April 11, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 10, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 07, 2022Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 09, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 14, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: September 14, 2022Supplemental Brief Filed
Date: August 03, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: August 06, 2021Reply Filed Electronically
Date: October 19, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 01, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Court Order Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: August 20, 2021Answer Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: September 24, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: March 06, 2023Declaration re:
Date: June 16, 2022Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Answer Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 05, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 06, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 03, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 14, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: August 02, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 02, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 19, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 02, 2021Trial Setting Order filed
Date: August 02, 2021Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: August 24, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 01, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 02, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 14, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 11, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: August 02, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
May 09, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
October 26, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply Filed Electronically | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically KHD's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Plaintiff's motion to strike or alternatively tax, Defendants' costs |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60.00 ck paid 9/27/23 motion fee |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by defendants on 09/06/23 |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Filed | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Order Filed Ruling on Motion to Quash Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.