Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Amador, Alma Rosa, Amador, Alonso, Amador, Annette, Amador, Anthony, Moran, Haydee, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kennedy Wilshire Pc, Kennedy Wilshire P.C., Wilshire Law Firm, against Does 2 Through 50, Kao Logistics, Inc., Keystone Automotive Operations, Inc., Martin, James Joseph, represented by Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara Llp, Romero, Robert John, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Declaration re:
Date: January 27, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 28, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 29, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 14, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: January 27, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 23, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 29, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 23, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 23, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 06, 2022Miscellaneous Opposition Filed
Date: October 14, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 04, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 12, 2020Notice Filed
Date: January 11, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: February 16, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 21, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 23, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 14, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 28, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: October 13, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 11, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 28, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: January 05, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 24, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 16, 2023Motion re:
Date: January 27, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 13, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 29, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 18, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 06, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: January 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
January 18, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Confidential Settlement of Entire Case |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Filed by Plaintiff Anthony Amador |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Filed by Plaintiff Alonso Amador |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Filed by Plaintiff Annette Amador |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Filed by Alma Rosa Amador |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Lien filed by plaintiff on 3.10.23 |
|
March 02, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): substitution of attorney as to all plaintiffs' returned due to needing each plaintiff to do their own substitution of attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.