Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nelson & Kennard, against Kilbian D Acosta, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Lewis A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLewis A. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2005 |
CategoryContract - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time192 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
OFFICIAL COURT FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC68152 AND GC68153 Not Applicable |
|
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Vacated |
|
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY Not Applicable |
|
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE HEARING - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF NON-SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/22/2005 OF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY KILBIAN D ACOSTA. FEE FOR NON SERVICE $45.00. Not Applicable |
|
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Completed |
|
April 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY Not Applicable |
|
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF NON-SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/22/2005 OF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY KILBIAN D ACOSTA. FEE FOR NON SERVICE $45.00. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.