Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Editha Cuyugan Wyma, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Kathleen Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
COPY(IES) AND CERTIFICATION(S) Not Applicable |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: NAME CHANGE FILED BY EDITHA WYMA - Minutes GRANTED |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF OSC FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED; DATES OF PUBLICATION: 052518. 060118, 060818, 061518 Not Applicable Judge: Kathleen Murphy |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
NAME CHANGE TRANSMITTAL RETURNED FROM SHERIFF Not Applicable |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NAME CHANGE TRANSMITTAL SENT TO SHERIFF FOR APPLICANT - EDITHA CUYUGAN WYMA; AKA: EDITHA CUYUGAN BASCO EDITA CUYUGAN BASCO; DATE OF BIRTH: 12/01/53; GENDER: FEMALE; HEARING DATE: 07/24/18 Not Applicable |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 7/24/18 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14
Judge: John H. Sugiyama |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 14
Judge: John H. Sugiyama |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC TO/FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY EDITHA CUYUGAN WYMA Not Applicable |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.