Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sarah Amer Abdalkreem, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Kathleen Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
COPY(IES) AND CERTIFICATION(S) Not Applicable |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: NAME CHANGE FILED BY SARAH AMER ABDALKREEM - Minutes GRANTED |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF OCS FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED; DATES OF PUBLICATION: 052218. 052918, 060518, 061218 Not Applicable Judge: Kathleen Murphy |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
NAME CHANGE TRANSMITTAL RETURNED FROM SHERIFF Not Applicable |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 14
Judge: John H. Sugiyama |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 7/12/18 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14
Judge: John H. Sugiyama |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NAME CHANGE TRANSMITTAL SENT TO SHERIFF FOR APPLICANT - SARAH AMER ABDALKREEM; AKA: NA NA; DATE OF BIRTH: 11/13/88; GENDER: FEMALE; HEARING DATE: 07/12/18 Not Applicable |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
(U.J.) PETITION TO/FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.