Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jesse Delcarlo filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Patricia M. Scanlon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time20 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: REQ TO TERM CHRO SET BY RICHARD CERVANTES - Minutes DENIED |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: REQ TO TERM CHRO SET BY RICHARD CERVANTES - Minutes | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE FILED Not Applicable |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO HRG ON REQ TO TERMINATE CHRO FILED BY RICHARD CERVANTES Not Applicable |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO TERMINATE CHRO FILED BY RICHARD CERVANTES Not Applicable |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | SPECIAL SET HEARING WAS SET FOR 12/03/20 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. PITT | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
FEE RECEIVED FOR MTN TO TERM FROM RICHARD CERVANTES Not Applicable |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: REQUEST TO TERMINATE CIVIL HARRASSMENT RO SET BY RICHARD R. CERVANTES - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.