Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kristin Miller, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time34 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF CH OAH ON SIDNEY HOLTER III FILED. SERVED ON 01/29/10 Not Applicable |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFTER HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT FILED; PROTECTED PERSON: KRISTIN MILLER/ ORDER EXPIRES: 01/25/15 Not Applicable |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC/TRO RE: HARASSMENT (CIVIL) FILED BY KRISTIN MILLER - Minutes GRANTED |
|
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF SIDNEY HOLTER III FILED RE: REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER Not Applicable |
|
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE OF SIDNEY HOLTER III TO PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF ANSWER TO CH TRO ON SIDNEY HOLTER III FILED. SERVED ON 01/22/10 Not Applicable |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC/TRO RE: HARASSMENT (CIVIL) FILED BY KRISTIN MILLER - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION & ORDER FOR RE-ISSUANCE OF CH TRO FILED BY SIDNEY HOLTER III Not Applicable |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
(CIVIL HARASSMENT) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL HARASSMENT RO REQUEST FILED 12/31/2009 OF KRISTIN MILLER AS TO SIDNEY HOLTER III, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/02/10 Not Applicable |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
PETITION OF KRISTIN MILLER FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT AND APPLICATION FOR TRO FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.