Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of San Pablo, filed a(n) Petition For Writ Of Mandate case against City Council Of The City Of Richmond, City Of Richmond, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryPetition For Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time166 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
June 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR STATUS OF CASE/SETTLEMENT VACATED |
|
June 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL & PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CITY OF SAN PABLO Not Applicable |
|
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR STATUS OF CASE/SETTLEMENT NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF DEREK S VAN FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPL TO EXTEN TIME FOR RESP PLEADING Not Applicable |
|
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION & ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR RESP PLDING FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 5/01/06 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 33 | |
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
STIP & ORDER RE RESP & REAL PARTIES SHALL HAVE ADD ITIONAL 60 DAYS TO RESPOND TO PTN FOR WRIT Not Applicable |
|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATIONTO STAY LITIGATION FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.