Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica L, against Martin V Garcia, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2007 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions354 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time437 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BUT NOT ENTERED- CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 11/10/08 Not Applicable |
|
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes CONTINUE |
|
August 27, 2008 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 10/28/08 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 29 | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT OSC ISSUED |
|
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 22 TO 29. Not Applicable |
|
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FLING COMPLAINT VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.