Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Beyer, Christopher, against Sarah Demello, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management153 days |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2007 |
CategoryCollections - Limited Civil ($25,000.00 Or Less) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 11/27/07 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 22 | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE OSC ISSUED |
|
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.