Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bay Ecm Group, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Birkhimer, Dennis C, against John H. Jackman, represented by Anderson, Donald E., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
CategoryContract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions313 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER FIXING REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES TO BE AWARDED AS COSTS FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF RECORDATION OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR ORDER RESCHEDULING ORDER OF EXAMINATION FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION AS TO JOHN H. JACKMAN - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION FOR JOHN H. JACKMAN FILED. Not Applicable |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR ORDER FIXING REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY BAY ECM GROUP, LLC - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO DEC OF ANDERSON IN OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR ORDER FILED BY BAY ECM GROUP, LLC Not Applicable |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR ORDER FIXING ATTY FEES FILED BY DEFENDANT. Not Applicable |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.