Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Boornazian, Jensen, & Garth, P.C., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Booska, Steven A, against Frederic L Dame, Rickla Construction Company, Inc., represented by Michael W. Rupprecht, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Lewis A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLewis A. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2006 |
CategoryCollections - Limited Civil ($25,000.00 Or Less) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time54 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
OFFICIAL COURT FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC68152 AND GC68153 Not Applicable |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ENTERED Not Applicable |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
STATUS OF 0002 JUDGMENT IS SATISFIED Not Applicable |
|
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
June 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: EVIDENCE RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT SET BY COURT - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: EVIDENCE RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT SET BY COURT - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: EVIDENCE RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT SET BY COURT - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RICKLA CONSTRUCTIONCOMPANY, INC., FREDERIC L DAME - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF FREDRIC L. DAME FILED RE: TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.