Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Constance L. Unick, filed a(n) Pi/Pd/Non-Mv case represented by Miranda, Dante, against City Of Pittsburg, represented by Bertrand, Fox & Elliot, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Clare M. Maier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClare M. Maier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Non-Mv |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE VACATED |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CONSTANCE L. UNICK Not Applicable |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF PITTSBURG Not Applicable |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 36 TO 09. Not Applicable |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CONSTANCE L. UNICK Not Applicable |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.