Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alyan, Ashraf, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Castaneda, Damian R, against Hodhod, Ingy, Hodhod, Salma, Ismail, Nancy, represented by Golovets, Alexander, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas, Danielle K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas, Danielle K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management139 days |
Filing DateMarch 14, 2019 |
Category16: Unlimited Fraud |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Hearing set for:
Date: March 14, 2019*Case Management Conference
Date: July 31, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 16, 2019Original Summons Issued/Filed
Date: March 14, 2019Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed
Date: May 12, 2020*Further Case Management Conference
Date: January 08, 2020Correspondence Memo:
Date: December 31, 2019*
Date: May 21, 2020Correspondence Memo:
Date: May 08, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Complete |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NANCY ISMAIL Not Applicable |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ASHRAF ALYAN Not Applicable |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY EMAIL OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ON ALEXANDER GOLOVETS FILED; SERVED ON 01/14/22 Not Applicable |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: PLTFS FAILURE TO PROVIDE THE CLERK WITH NEW DECLA ATIONS CONTAINING REDACTED EXHIBITS BY 5/21/21 - Minutes DISCHARGED |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Complete |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.