Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Asghar Poornasir, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Judge, Edward A, against Paul Famular, represented by Merida, Sonia C, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Fannin, Jill C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFannin, Jill C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2019 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Complaint Filed - Summons Issued
Date: January 15, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Answer to:
Date: May 29, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of/to:
Date: August 20, 2020Notice of/to:
Date: June 12, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 21, 2020Change of Address
Date: July 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 7 DAY(S) - Minutes | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE CONFERENCE - Minutes | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 7 DAY(S) - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CONFERENCE - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE TO 4-5-21:30 D21/ISSUE CONF IS CONTINUED TO 3-11-21 8:30 D21 Not Applicable |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIP & SIGNED ORD TO CONT TRIAL SENT TO CLKS OFFI CE Not Applicable |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION @@X@@ FILED Stipulation Filed Re: STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT TO CONTINUE FEBRUARY 5, 2021 FILED FFT: (TRIAL DATE) |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
FEE RECEIVED FOR STIP AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE BY ASGHAR POORNASIR Not Applicable |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT TO CONTINUE FEBRUARY 5, 2021 FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.