Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barbara Beanum, filed a(n) Pi/Pd/Non-Mv case represented by Mittelman, Mark R., against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals,, Nazirov, Marat, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc, represented by Harper, S. Bradford, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Jill C. Fannin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2018 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Non-Mv |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
||
Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 03, 2019Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: June 21, 2019DOE Amendment Filed
Date: March 25, 2019Change of Address
Date: November 30, 2018Answer to:
Date: November 09, 2018Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED Notice of Entry of Dismissal Filed |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Summary Motion JUDGMENT+0004+ |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - NADT%%. EAW: Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice Entire action dismissed with prejudice |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED @@X@@ @@X@@ FILED BY @@X@@ AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED @@|@@BY@@X@@ CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BYBEANUM, BARBARA DD: JURY Trial Requested, Time Estimate: 5-7 DAYS |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
@@X@@ @@X@@ DEFT'S EXHIBIT TABLE OF CONTENTS FILED %%X%% |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF @@X@@ FILED RE: @@X@@ @@X@@ @@X@@ Declaration Re: DECLARATION OF NICOLE HANNINGTON FILED RE: ISO DEFT'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT %%X%% %%X%% |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.