Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
City Of Oakley, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Perez, Elizabeth M, against All Persons Unknown Claiming An Interest In, All Persons Unknown Claiming An Interest In The Property, Weder, Claude, Weder, Joyce, represented by Jenny, Scott E., Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Charles S. Treat presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions353 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Case Cycle Time353 days |
Answer to:
Date: February 15, 2018Opposition to:
Date: February 15, 2018Declaration Re:
Date: February 15, 2018Correspondence Memo:
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of/to:
Date: February 21, 2018Proof of Service by Notice & Acknowledgement of Receipt
Date: March 05, 2018Declaration Re:
Date: January 18, 2018*
Date: May 25, 2018Correspondence Memo:
Date: January 31, 2018Original Summons Issued/Filed
Date: January 02, 2018Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 07, 2018Proof of Service by Notice & Acknowledgement of Receipt
Date: March 05, 2018Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens Notice of/to: Withdrawal of Lis Pendens |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT VACATED |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF @@X@@ FILED Notice of Entry of: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF @@X@@ FILED Notice of Entry of: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED Not Applicable |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED Not Applicable |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Before Trial JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 12/21/18 CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - STIT%%. JST: CASE STATUS CHANGED TO JUDGMENT BOJ: Judgment on Complaint/Petition JFP: JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition FOR PLAINTIFF 10001 JAD: JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition AGAINST DEFENDANT 30002-30003 FFT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF JUST COMPENSATION TO BE PAID FFT: TO DEFENDANT FOR THE CONDEMNATION OF ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST TO A PORTION OF ASSESSOR FFT: PARCEL NO. APN 037-160-021-4, MORE PARTICULARLY DESCRIBED AS ASSESSOR'S PARCEL NUMBER FFT: 037-160-021-4, AN INTERIOR PARCEL WITH A 154.5-FOOT FRONTAGE ALONG MAIN STREET WITH A FFT: 184-FOOT DEPTH ON THE EAST SIDE AND A 254-FOOT DEPTH ON THE WEST SIDE FFT: (A MAP SHOWING THE LOCATION OF THE PROPERTY IS ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT 1, AND A LEGAL FFT: DESCRIPTION FOR WHICH I ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT 2, BOTH OF WHICH ARE AND INCORPORATED BY THIS FFT: REFERENCE AS THOUGH FULLY SET FORTH HEREIN) IS THE SUM OF ONE MILLION TWO-HUNDRED FIFTY FFT: THOUSAND DOLLARS (1,250.000), INCLUSIVE OF INTEREST, ATTORNEY'S FEES, DAMAGES, RECOVERABLE FFT: COSTS, AND ANY ELEMENT OF PAYMENT OF COMPENSATION WHATSOEVER. ANY INTEREST THAT FFT: WOULD OTHERWISE BE CALCULATED PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS FFT: 1268.310-1268.360, OR AS OTHERWISE PROVIDED BY LAW, IS INCLUDED WITHIN THE ABOVE-REFERENCED FFT: SETTLEMENT AMOUNT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT: UPON ENTRY OF THIS FFT: JUDGMENT, THE STATE TREEASURER SHALL DRAW A WARRANT ON THE STATE TREASURY, CONDEMNATION FFT: DEPOSIT FUND, FOR THE ENTIRE AMOUNT OF THE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN THE SUM OF NINE HUNDRED THOUSAND FFT: DOLLARS ($900,000.00), MADE PAYABLE AS FOLLOWS: FFT: JENNY & JENNY LLP CLIENT TRUST ACCOUNT C/O SCOTT E. JENNY FFT: CALIFORNIA 94553. CITY SHALL, ON OR BEFORE THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER THE ENTRY OF THIS FFT: JUDGMENT, PAY TO DEFENDANT THE BALANCE OF THE TOTAL AWARD IN THE SUM OF THREE HUNDRED FIFTY FFT: THOUSAND DOLLARS ($350,000.00), BY A CHECK MADE PAYABLE AS FOLLOWS: JENNY & JENNY LLP CLIENT FFT: TRUST ACCOUNT C/O SCOTT E. JENNY, ESQ., 736 FERRY STREET, MARTINEZ, CALIFORNIA 94553. (SEE FFT: JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). CMPD: Complaint/Petition Dispositioned MSCAN: MICROFILMED/SCANNED ON 12/21/18 |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
@@X@@ @@X@@ FINAL ORDER OF CONDENMATION FILED %%X%% MSCAN: MICROFILMED/SCANNED ON 12/21/18 |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 12/21/18 Not Applicable Judge: Charles S. Treat |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF CONDENMATION FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.