Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alward Construction, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Griffin, Jr, Thomas P, against Dorian Van Cleve, Paradigm Custom Floors, Inc, represented by Butt, Daniel, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Judith S. Craddick presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2015 |
CategoryContract/Breach Of Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time444 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED Notice of Entry of Dismissal Filed |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - NADT%%. ENTACT: Entire Action Dismissed Without Prejudice Entire action dismissed without prejudice |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED @@|@@BY@@X@@ CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BYALWARD CONSTRUCTION, , INC DD: JURY Trial Requested, Time Estimate: 2-3 DAYS |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALWARD CONSTRUCTION, INC Not Applicable |
|
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.