Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Federated Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Werner, Phillip, against Aguiar, Guelsi, Juan Ruiz, Machado, Francis Rolando, Roadking Auto Transport Corp., represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Jon R. Rolefson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Rolefson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2014 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Motor Vehicle (Martinez) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time257 days |
Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: December 03, 2014*
Date: April 06, 2015Request for Clerk/Court Judgment Filed
Date: April 06, 2015Certificate of Facts Issued
Date: November 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF FACTS ISSUED 111015 151110-0127-CK COF/ 5.00 Paymt Operator Code: SOZUN *FEE: 151110-0127-CK COF/ 5.00 Paymt | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF FACTS ISSUED 111015 Not Applicable |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: @@X@@ Correspondence Memo: CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: CERTIFICATE OF FACTS RE UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT MIN2: UNABLE TO PROCESS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: THE TIME FRAME OF 90 DAYS IS NOT ACCURATELY MIN2: REFLECTED IN SECTION TWO. THE DATE JUDGMENT BECOMES FINAL SHOULD BE REFLECTED AS 90 DAYS MIN2: FROM THE DATE JUDGMENT WAS ENTERED (07 01 2015). JUST FIX THE DATE JUDGMENT BECOMES FINAL AND MIN2: RE-SUBMIT FOR PROCESSING. THANK YOU. THANK YOU. CMPAM: CORRESPONDENCE MEMORANDUM PRINTED AND MAILED THIS DATE TO THE FOLLOWING PARTY(IES): 0001 *NOT: NOTICE PRINTED FOR PW19 / ON 10/21/15 Judge: Jon R. Rolefson |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: CERTIFICATE OF FACTS RE UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT Not Applicable |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR JUDGMENT VACATED |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON @@X@@ Judgment Entered Before Trial JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 07/01/15 CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - DJCT%%. JST: CASE STATUS CHANGED TO JUDGMENT BOJ: Judgment on Complaint/Petition JFP: JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition FOR PLAINTIFF 10001 JAD: JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition AGAINST DEFENDANT 30002-30003 JAM: PRINCIPAL $29,275.00, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, INTEREST $0.00, COSTS $435.00 TJ: TOTAL JUDGMENT 0002 CMPD: Complaint/Petition Dispositioned MSCAN: MICROFILMED/SCANNED ON 07/01/15 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 07/01/15 Not Applicable |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT SENT TO CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING | |
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk`s tickler was set for 7/15/15 at 7:00 in Dept34 | |
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.