Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cathrine Dagmar Dyson, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Per, against Indymac Mortgage Services Onewest Bank, Onewest Bank, Fsb, represented by Unrepresented, Zaro, David R, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Laurel S. Brady (Lindenbaum) presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2013 |
CategoryContract/Breach Of Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions447 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time447 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT ONEWEST BANK N.A. FOR ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH CM: PREJUDICE FILED CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - CDIT%%. WP: With Prejudice |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR FOR ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FILED BY ONEWEST BANK, FSB 140909-0105-CC MOT/ 60.00 Paymt Operator Code: DWEBE *FEE: 140909-0105-CC MOT/ 60.00 Paymt *REFNM: 140909-0105-CC Reference Number 055173 |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT ONEWEST BANK N.A. FOR ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH Not Applicable |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FILED BY ONEWEST BANK, FSB Not Applicable |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing on Demurrer to: | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2013 OF CATHRINE DYSON (GREGOIRE) FILED BY ONEWEST BANK, FSB - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of/to: NOTICE OF/TO RULING FILED BY ONEWEST BANK, FSB |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO RULING FILED BY ONEWEST BANK, FSB Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.