Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Creditone Llc, Creditone Llc Assignee Of Wellsfargo Business Line, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lief, Amy, against Tang, David H, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with David E. Goldstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Goldstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management475 days |
Filing DateJune 23, 2011 |
CategoryContract/Breach Of Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions195 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time546 days |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued
Date: December 12, 2022Proof of Service
Date: January 06, 2023Memorandum of Costs After Judgment
Date: December 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for and Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | EXEMPLIFICATION ISSUED 200706-0128-CK EXM/ 50.00 CPY/ 1.00 Paymt Operator Code: ABROO *FEE: 200706-0128-CK EXM/ 50.00 CPY/ 1.00 Paymt *REFNM: 200706-0128-CK Reference Number 14335 | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXEMPLIFICATION ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 06/03/19 TO LA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00 | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 06/03/19 TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00 Not Applicable Judge: David E. Goldstein |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $85,412.97 190603-0205-CK ICR/ 25.00 Paymt Operator Code: BPOOL *FEE: 190603-0205-CK ICR/ 25.00 Paymt *REFNM: 190603-0205-CK Reference Number 999717 | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $85,412.97 FILE RETURNED TO FILE UNIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.