Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express Bank, Fsb, American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint case represented by Hoffman, Martin, against Kabra, Anurag, represented by Pro Per, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Brian F. Haynes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian F. Haynes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management139 days |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2009 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions189 days |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Amendment Filed Re:
Date: October 21, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: November 14, 2022Lodge Order/Judgment
Date: October 21, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 15, 2022Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued
Date: March 14, 2022Application for and Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190)
Date: March 14, 2022Memorandum of Costs After Judgment
Date: March 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: amendment Order Filed Re: on amendment to plaintiffs name ccp section 473 |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notes To clerk's office for filing- Order on amendment |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notes Proposed Order on Amendment to Plaintiffs name CCP section 473 sent to D09 |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amendment Filed Re: To plaintiffs name CCP 473 Amendment Filed Re: To plaintiffs name CCP 473 |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on Amendment to Plaintiffs name CCP section 473 Lodge Order/Judgment |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Re renewal of judgment |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for and Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 04/14/16 TO Contra Costa COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.