Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm Generalinsurance Company, filed a(n) Pi/Pd/Non-Mv case represented by Wall, Esq., Robert E, against General Plumbing Supply Company, Inc, Wal-Rich Corporation, represented by Robinson, Ralph W, Wheeler, R Dewey, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Anita L. Santos presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Non-Mv |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time456 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSL VACATED |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal Filed NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED Not Applicable |
|
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RE CROSS COMPLAINT OF GENERA L PLUMBING SUPPLY INC WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RE CROSS COMPLAINT OF GENERA L PLUMBING SUPPLY INC WITH PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Entire action dismissed with prejudice REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - NADT%%. EAW: Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of/to: NOTICE OF/TO (UNCONDITIONAL) SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED ON BEHALF OF STATE FARM GENERAL, INSURANCE CO MPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.