Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Julie Sewill, filed a(n) 08: Unlimited Civil Rights case represented by Martin, Esq., John F., against Kenn Nay, Magganas Properties, Maxaco, Llc, Maxco Llc, represented by Harrington, Lindsay S., Noda, John A, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Reyes, Benjamin T, II presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
Category08: Unlimited Civil Rights |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time281 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Entire action dismissed with prejudice REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - NADT%%. EAW: Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice |
|
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATED RESTRAINING ORDER FILED %%X%% | |
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
STIPULATED RESTRAINING ORDER FILED Not Applicable |
|
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference | |
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED RETURN FROM MEDIATION MEDIAT: Mediation COMPLETE: MEDIATOR'S REPORT RECEIVED | |
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULED RETURN FROM MEDIATION COMPLETED |
|
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk`s tickler was set for 11/26/07 at 7:00 in Dept16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.