Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alonzo Bennett, Mary Margaret Narcis-Bennett, filed a(n) Pi/Pd/Non-Mv case represented by Feavel, Patrick M., against Bigge Crane Inc., Bigge Group, Dan Albert Calvin, represented by Caspari, William S, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Virginia M. George presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management46 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Non-Mv |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time320 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL+PLAINTIFF+ |
|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Entire action dismissed with prejudice REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - NADT%%. EAW: Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice |
|
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing set for: Hearing on OSC was set for 11/27/06 at 9:00 in dept. 30 |
|
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 11/27/06 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 30 | |
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial MEDIUM+5+ |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL - MEDIUM CAUSE/ 5 DAY(S) VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.