Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
City Of Brentwood, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Mcdonough, Holland& Allen, against American Securities Company, American Securities Company Trustee Under A Deed Of Trust Recorded November 4, 2003, Bank Of Agriculture And Commerce, Bank Of Agriculture And Commerce Service, Beckstrand, Annette, (total of 13) See All represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Rebecca C. Hardie presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management64 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
COPY(IES) AND CERTIFICATION(S) Not Applicable |
|
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS FILED | |
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION (P) FEE TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY IS CONDEMNED & TAKEN FFT: FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONSTRUCTING IMPROVEMENT RELATED TO THE EXTENSION OF O'HARA AVE PROJECT CM: APN: 0616-080-020 | |
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION (P) FEE TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY IS CONDEMNED & TAKEN Not Applicable |
|
July 15, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION SENT TO RM 103 | |
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Before Trial JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 07/07/05 CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - DJCT%%. JST: CASE STATUS CHANGED TO JUDGMENT BOJ: Judgment on Complaint/Petition JFP: JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition FOR PLAINTIFF 10001 JAD: JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition AGAINST DEFENDANT 30010 FFT: CITY OF BRENTWOOD REQ DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENT. ON DEFT AMERICAN SECURITIES CO,TRUSTEE UNDER DEED FFT: OF TRUST RECORDED 11-4-03. PLTF & DEFT DOUGLAS & ANNETTE BECKSTRAND ENT. INTO A STIPULATED FFT: JUDGMENT SIGNED BY THIS CT ON 5-4-05. FFT: ALL OTHER DEFTS TO THIS ACTION HAVE BEEN DISMISSED EXCEPT AMERICAN SECURITIES WHO NEVER FFT: RESPONDED TO COMPLT. MICRO: MICROFILMED ON 07/07/05 1/7/08 USE MSCAN |
|
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 07/07/05 Not Applicable |
|
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (AM.SECURITIES CO) SENT TO RM 103 | |
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.