Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Phirus Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Randolph, John D, against Don Farrelly, Pacific Building Inc, represented by Hyden, Timothy M, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2004 |
CategoryContract/Breach Of Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time229 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 3 DAY(S) VACATED |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULED RETURN FROM MEDIATION COMPLETED |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
MEDIATOR`S REPORT RECEIVED: FULL AGREEMENT SCHEDULED ON 08/02/05, MEDIATOR TIME SPENT 1.7 HOURS Not Applicable |
|
June 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DATE, TIME & PLACE OF MEDIATION HEARING.HEARING SET FOR 08/02/05 AT 10:00 FILED 06/29/05 Not Applicable |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR Not Applicable |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE MEDIATOR ADDED AS A PARTY Not Applicable |
|
May 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes COMPLETED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.