Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beverly Jean Wright, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Willis & Lawrence, against John Robert Wright, represented by Price, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 1991 |
CategoryPetn For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: MINUTES & ORDER FILED 2/23/09 MAILED TO MARK PRICE ESQ ON 3/24/09 Not Applicable |
|
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: MINUTES & ORDER FILED 2/23/09 MAILED TO JOHN R WRIGHT & BEVERLY J WRIGHT ON 3/24/09 Not Applicable |
|
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: SUB OF ATTY, RESP, INCOME & EXP DEC DCSS 02/19/09 Not Applicable |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON DCSS MTN/OSC TO/FOR ADD/INCREASE LIQUIDATION ON ARREARS ( COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA) - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
MINUTES AND ORDER AFTER 02/23/09 HEARING FILED Not Applicable |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE OF JOHN ROBERT WRIGHT TO GOVERNMENTAL NOTICE OF MOTION/OSC FILED; HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/23/09 AT 01:00 IN 52 Not Applicable |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY FAX OF SUB OF ATTY; RESPONSE TO GOVT NOTICE TO OSC ON DEPT OF CHILD SUPPORT SVCS FILED; SERVED ON 02/17/09 Not Applicable |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOHN ROBERT WRIGHT Not Applicable |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. PRO PER SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR JOHN ROBERT WRIGHT AND IS REPLACED BY MARK A PRICE Not Applicable |
|
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NOTICE OF MOTION FILED 10/31/08 MAILED TO JOHN R WRIGHT & BEVERLY J BUTLER ON 11/18/08 Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.