Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Motorists Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Foell & Elder, against Ortiz, Francisco, Fernandez, Perla, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M. Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions103 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time118 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
November 19, 2010 | |||
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 13, 2010 |
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION MAILED TO LOS ANGELES SHERIFF |
|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION JOHN M PACHECO,JUDGE CLERK: ATISHMA KANT COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY ROBERT MORRIS ON BEHALF OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGMENT DEBTOR PERLA FERN |
|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION: CLAIM WAS PARTIALLY GRANTED BY COURT. | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP31 |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed MEMO TO COURT CLERK FROM LEVYING OFFICER FILED. |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.