Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Oseetah Capital Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc, against Vizcarra, Gustavo, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with W. Robert Fawke presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time216 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2010 | |||
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
July 06, 2010 |
Judge: Fawke, W Robert |
||
July 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC/DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO SERVE CRC 3.740 W ROBERT FAWKE PRESIDING. CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON NOT REPORTED - ATTORNEY INFORMATION PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - PLAINTIFF HAS FAILED TO APPAER AS REQUIRE |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S35 FOR HEARING |
|
June 04, 2010 |
Judge: Mettler, Sharon Elizabeth |
||
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 SHARON ELIZABETH METTLER PRESIDING. CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - ATTORNEY INFORMATION PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEA |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S35 FOR HEARING |
|
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled For: HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 6/04/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35 |
|
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order To Show Cause Re: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 11/19/10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.