Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Main Street Acquisition Corp, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nelson & Kennard, against Chavez, Karla H, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Mettler, Sharon presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management462 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions274 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time463 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Satisfied in the Amount of WRIT RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,875.96. |
|
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY; PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $12.00. |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP FOR 25.00 110609-2660-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Fee Voided ** VOID ** FEE RECEIPT# 110608-3570 VOIDED BY MLENI FROM RBRUC USED WRONG CODE |
|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP FOR WIP9A SB 110608-3570-CK FEE/ 25.00 PAYMT 110608-3570-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 262378 | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 3,281.00 ) |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $48.72 | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Credits Filed. Credits in the Amount of DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $727.00 FILED. |
|
April 20, 2011 | |||
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC/DISMISSAL-NONDISPOSITIONED DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.