Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ford Motor Credit Company, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Reese Law Group, A Professional Law Corporation, against Lemoine, Louis E, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 28, 2009 |
CategoryApplication For Renewal Of Judgment-Limited |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2067 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED -- (FROM LA, FULLY SATISFIED, COST $0) | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF MORGAN & REESE FOR FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY CHANGES ITS NAME TO REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION FILED |
|
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed - Status is now: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED. |
|
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,118.35 |
|
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL: ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION RECEIVED BACK FROM LOUIS E LEMOINE. | |
December 30, 2009 |
Judge: Gafkowski, Frank |
||
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FRANK GAFKOWSKI PRESIDING. CLERK: BRONWYN MURPHY COURT REPORTER JULIE NAREZ-ARMBRUSTER;12512 COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT - APPEARANCES: DEFENDANT LOUIS E LEMOINE PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEM |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED |
|
December 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP31 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.