Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Ohara, John J, represented by Panzer, Mary Cheryl, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
Time To Management156 days |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time204 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2010 | |||
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
June 18, 2010 | |||
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
May 14, 2010 | |||
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CMC FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO MOTION WALL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.