Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Law Office Of Rosen And Loeb,
against
Garner, Ronald L,
in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
This case was filed in
San Bernardino County
Superior Courts
San Bernardino.
Case Details for
Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc v. Garner, Ronald L
Case Events for
Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc v. Garner, Ronald L
Date
Type
Description
December 16, 2021
Docket Event
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Acknowlegment Of Satisfaction Of Judgment
November 22, 2021
Docket Event
Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied
June 14, 2017
Docket Event
Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,605.69
June 14, 2017
Docket Event
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC.
June 14, 2017
Docket Event
Judgment Filed - Status is now: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED.
November 24, 2015
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $80.00.
May 08, 2015
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( $8,207.55 )
May 08, 2015
Docket Event
FILING FEE PAID BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC FOR WRIT 150508-0734-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 150508-0734-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 67767
May 06, 2015
Docket Event
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $34.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,542.86)
March 29, 2012
Docket Event
Miscellaneous Document Filed RETURN ON ATTACHMENT - EXECUTION FILED.