Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Adams, Olivia B, Stewart, Gregory, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Complaint case represented by Pro Se, against Beltway Capital Management, Llc, Bsi Financial Services, Inc., First Franklin Financial Corp., First Franklin Financial Corporation, Fontanini, Angela M, (total of 7) See All represented by Partridge, William Lindsay, Pite, Duncan Llp, Wolfe & Wyman Llp, Wright, Finlay & Zak, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
Time To Management1 days |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2009 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Complaint |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time248 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2012 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA GABLE COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND NOTICE |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL VI SENT TO CP34 |
|
January 23, 2012 | |||
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Decision By Reviewing Court: APPEAL IS DISMISSED BY REVIEWING COURT. |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: REMITTITUR REMITTITUR ISSUED. COMPLAINT DISPOSITIONED - APPEAL TERMINATED PRIOR TO ORAL ARGUMENT. |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR FILED. | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed NOTICE OF RULING ON CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE FILED. |
|
January 13, 2012 |
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOHN M PACHECO,JUDGE CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH;11048 COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: OLIVIA B ADAMS LUKASZ WOZNIAK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BELTWAY CAPITAL MANAGEMEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.