Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Soward, Marcus, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Complaint case represented by Cho, Sheasby, Chung & Ignacio Llp, against Bank Of America, A Delware Corporation, Mtc Financial Inc.,A California Corporation, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corporation, A Florida Corporation, represented by Severson & Werson, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
Time To Management184 days |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2009 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Complaint |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions142 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time142 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2010 | |||
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 100408-1715-CK FCP/ 1.50 PAYMT 100408-1715-CK REFERENCE NUMBER #79131 | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO CALENDAR WALL |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING. CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: COMPLAINT DISMISSED ACTION - |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: DEMURRER * FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING. CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PLAINTIFF HA |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLA COMPLAINT * FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING. CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MARCUS SOWARD FILED BY MARCUS SOWARD, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DISMISS COMPLAINT OF MARCUS SOWARD, ON 03/19/10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.