Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
California Housing Finance Agency, A Political Subdivision And Public, Loma Linda Homeowners Association, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Brown, Edmund Gerald, against California Housing Finance Agency, A Political Subdivision And Public, Goodman Dean, Inc., Loma Linda Homeowners Association, Cresta Linda Homeowners Association, Rothman, Larry, (total of 6) See All represented by Larry Rothman & Associates, The Durst Law Firm, The Justice Law Center, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions772 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time1149 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Destroyed Pursuant to Court Order EXHIBITS DESTROYED ON 03/09/17 PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER FILED 03/08/17. |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED ON 03/08/17 | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIES | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | SUBPOENAS DESTROYED. | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Decision By Reviewing Court: JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED BY REVIEWING COURT. |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR FILED. | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Complete APPEAL OF LARRY ROTHMAN COMPLETE |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEAL COMPLETE | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Department Changed DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM S35 TO S22. TO . |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File COURT OF APPEAL ORDER RE: PETITION FOR REHEARING IS DENIED PLACED IN FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.