Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Bernardino, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by San Bernardino County Counsel, against Martinez, Isaac, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Frank J. Gafkowski presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management205 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions201 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time225 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Orange WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM ORANGE COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Orange WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY. ( IN THE AMOUNT OF $220,003.02 ) |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pursuant to Government Code Section 6103.5 Fees are Waived PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00. |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $100,030.79) |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $30.00. |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( $119,917.23 ) |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 | |
July 16, 2010 | |||
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.