Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Golden West Plumbing, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Plumtree, Angelina Maria, against Richmond American Homes Of California, Richmond American Homes Of California, A Surrendered California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Frangie, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management205 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time156 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2010 | |||
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQ FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DISMISSAL WAS FILED ON 3/19/10 . |
|
March 23, 2010 | |||
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE: SANCTION FTA MARIA PLUMTREE 020510 JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING. CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED THE DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY PLU |
|
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. | |
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S32 FOR HEARING |
|
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF DISMISSING OSC RE SANCTIONS FILED BY GOLDEN WEST PLUMBING, INC., A CALIFORNIA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.