Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Target National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude & Felix, against Romero, Gricelda, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2010 | |||
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 30, 2010 | |||
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34 | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 091103-2827-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.