Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Inland Valley Development Agency A Joint Powers Authority, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Complaint case represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, against All Persons Interested In The Matter Of Thevalidation Of Inland Valley Development Age, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Donald R. Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management184 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Complaint |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions139 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time398 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 170405-0904-CK FCP/ 59.50 PAYMT 170405-0904-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 93330 | |
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 170404-0860-CK FCP/ 30.00 PAYMT 170404-0860-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 93324 | |
November 16, 2010 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes DEFAULT HEARING DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JESSICA MARZULLO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON: DEFAULT PROVE UP HELD PREDIS |
|
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
October 27, 2010 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON: OSC RE DISMISSAL HELD PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ORDERED CONTINUE |
|
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT COURT AFTER DEFAULT & DECL OF ELIZABE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.