Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Forde, Maritza C, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Koch, Poonam Kaur, against Aurora Loan Services, Llc An Unknown Business Entity, First Magnus Financial Corporation An Arizona Corporation, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, An Unknown Business Entity, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
Time To Management156 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryReal Property |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time285 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2010 |
Judge: Mink, Michael |
||
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL | |
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL MICHAEL S MINK PRESIDING. CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - ATTORNEY INFORMATION PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION,, |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S35 |
|
April 16, 2010 | |||
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 19, 2010 | |||
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | STAY OF EXECUTION GRANTED ON CASE. REASON: HIGHER COURT ORDER | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION,. FEDERAL NUMBER UNKNOWN. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT A HEARING REGARDING THE STATUS OF REMOVAL IS SET FOR JULY 26, 2010 AT 08:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT S35. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.