Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rubio, Joe C, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Migler, James Louie, against Wells, Richard, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David S. Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management184 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty(Ltd) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions426 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time426 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Correspondence Received And Returned Not Read EXPARTE CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED FROM JOE RUBIO DATED 10/22/13 IS RETURNED NOT READ. |
|
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH JAMES MIGLER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOE C RUBIO. | |
August 19, 2013 |
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA;12612 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES MIGLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PLAINTIFF JOE C RUBIO PRESENT JUDGMENT DEBTO |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. 130716-1952-CS MMF/ 60.00 PAYMT | |
November 19, 2012 |
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON COURT REPORTER LINDA MEEKINS;10195 COURT ATTENDANT I ROMO - APPEARANCES: PLAINTIFF, JOE RUBIO PRESENT IN PRO PER. DEFENDANT/CITEE, RICHARD WELLS PRESENT IN PRO PER. - PROCEEDINGS: |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | ORAP RETURNED SERVED AS TO RICHARD WELLS. | |
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. | |
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JOE C RUBIO IS GRA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.