Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Palisades Collection, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc, against Bingham, Constance, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Merele D. Chapman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management100 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time296 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2010 | |||
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT OF PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC |
|
October 08, 2010 | |||
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
August 24, 2010 | |||
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC. |
|
July 14, 2010 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL BY MAIL ON 06/29/10 AS TO CONSTANCE BINGHAM, FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.