Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc, against Sigala, Daniel, Sigala, Genaro G, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
Time To Management135 days |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time240 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2010 | |||
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQ FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE WAS DISMISSED IN COURT ON 06/11/10 . |
|
June 11, 2010 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S32 FOR HEARING |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Set For: COURT TRIAL SET FOR 6/11/10 AT 9:00 IN S32 IS RESCHEDULED FOR AT IN DEPARTMENT |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32 | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Set For: COURT TRIAL SET FOR 6/11/10 AT 9:00 IN S34 - RESCHEDULED TO: IS RESCHEDULED FOR AT IN DEPARTMENT |
|
April 16, 2010 | |||
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC. |
|
February 26, 2010 |
Judge: Ludvigsen, Cynthia A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.