Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Arrow Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc, against Rivas, Gigi, represented by Lepore, Richard Amedeo, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael M. Dest presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00. |
|
August 10, 2018 | |||
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO AMEND JUDGMENT |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE LM37 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE TO VACATE PLA'S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC. |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO AMEND JUDGMENT MICHAEL M DEST,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY RICHARD A. LEPORE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RE |
|
June 12, 2018 |
Judge: Dest, Michael M |
||
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE:TO AMEND JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 06/12/18 FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC. (IMAGED) |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO AMEND JUDGMENT BARRY L PLOTKIN,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT D RICE - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY YU YANG FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY RICHARD A. LEPORE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.