Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Arrow Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc, against Healy, Lana, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Merele D. Chapman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management114 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time295 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2010 | |||
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DISMISSAL ENTERED ON 8/05/10 . |
|
August 06, 2010 | |||
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC FOR FAX FILING 100809-0438-VS FAX/ 3.00 PAYMT | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 024-0096991325 | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S32 FOR HRG |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.