Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fia Card Services N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc, against Orozco, Rachel G, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions377 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time359 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQ FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE WAS PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 10/08/10. |
|
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE COURT HAS PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED THIS CASE . |
|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED | |
October 08, 2010 |
Judge: Argento, Phillip |
||
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 PHILLIP J ARGENTO,JUDGE CLERK: VERONICA GAYTON COURT REPORTER IDA APPLEBY;6243 COURT ATTENDANT B VARTANIAN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APP |
|
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S34 |
|
April 16, 2010 | |||
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/16/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34. |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RACHEL G OROZCO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/08/09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.