Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Quiroz, Guadalupe, Quiroz, Jesus, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pro Se, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Right,, Estate Of Maria L Perez, Tapia, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Gafkowski, Frank presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management184 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryReal Property |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time190 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2010 | |||
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
April 16, 2010 |
Judge: Gafkowski, Frank |
||
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FRANK GAFKOWSKI PRESIDING. CLERK: LORI MOWLES COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. COURT CONTINUES MATTER IN ORDER TO EFFECT SER |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP37 |
|
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BY JESSE TAPIA WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 03/03/10 FILED | |
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BY ESTATE OF MARIA L PEREZ WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 03/03/10 FILED | |
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ESTATE OF MARIA L PEREZ. PARTY SERVED ON 03/03/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00. |
|
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO JESSE TAPIA. PARTY SERVED ON 03/03/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDMENT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.